OK HB1947 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles; lamps and other signal devices; use during conditions of rain; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; lamps and other signal devices; use during conditions of rain; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2019-03-12SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-12HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-11HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-11HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 17
2019-03-11HouseAmended
2019-03-11HouseHouse Rule suspended
2019-03-11HouseAuthored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
2019-03-11HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-28HouseCR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Roberts (Dustin)
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback