OK HB1943 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Waters and water rights; modifying the Oklahoma Floodplain Management Act.
Title
Waters and water rights; modifying the Oklahoma Floodplain Management Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-17 - House - House: Conference Committee on Natural Resources: , CONFEREES ARE UNABLE TO AGREE (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Died in conference | |
2011-05-16 | Conference granted, SCs named Branan, Nichols, Treat, Johnson (Rob), Burrage, Sparks | |
2011-05-03 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Natural Resources | |
2011-05-02 | SA's received | |
2011-05-02 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-27 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-27 | Emergency failed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 14 | |
2011-04-27 | Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 16 | |
2011-04-27 | Title stricken | |
2011-04-27 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-04-11 | coauthored by Fields | |
2011-04-11 | Emergency added | |
2011-04-11 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-14 | Second Reading referred to Energy | |
2011-03-08 | First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-07 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-07 | General Order | |
2011-02-23 | Removed from Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-23 | Placed on Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-23 | Authored by Senator Branan (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-23 | CR; Do Pass Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Jackson | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
82 | 1603 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1604 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1607 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1608 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1609 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1610 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1612 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1614 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1616 | New Code | See Bill Text |