OK HB1939 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Environment and natural resources; changing the name of the Oklahoma Waste Tire Recycling Act; modifying waste tire recycling fee for tires with certain rim sizes; effective date; emergency.
Title
Environment and natural resources; changing the name of the Oklahoma Waste Tire Recycling Act; modifying waste tire recycling fee for tires with certain rim sizes; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House: TABLE MOTION (Y: 7 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 53) [FAIL]
2011-03-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Natural Resources &: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House: TABLE MOTION (Y: 7 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 53) [FAIL]
2011-03-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Natural Resources &: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Approved by Governor 05/03/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-27 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-04-27 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-26 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-26 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-04-26 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 10 | |
2011-04-26 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-04-11 | Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-23 | Second Reading referred to Energy | |
2011-03-22 | First Reading | |
2011-03-21 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-17 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-17 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 7; Ayes: 68 Nays: 13 | |
2011-03-17 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Myers | |
2011-03-17 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Billy | |
2011-03-17 | General Order | |
2011-03-03 | Authored by Senator Johnson (Rob) (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-03 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Jackson | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27A | 2 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27A | 2 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27A | 2 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |