OK HB1932 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Public health and safety; specifying measurement in grams as well as ounces of marijuana product that a licensee may possess; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health and safety; specifying measurement in grams as well as ounces of marijuana product that a licensee may possess; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateReported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2019-03-13SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-13HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-12HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-12HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 2
2019-03-12HouseAuthored by Senator Shaw (principal Senate author)
2019-03-12HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-28HouseCR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Public Safety
2019-02-20HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Manger
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback