OK HB1931 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1931
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal procedure; making certain persons arrested for certain crimes ineligible for personal recognizance bonds; effective date.
Title
Criminal procedure; making certain persons arrested for certain crimes ineligible for personal recognizance bonds; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2020-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 19 |
2020-03-11 | House | Amended |
2020-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-11 | House | General Order |
2020-03-02 | House | Remove Representative Osburn as principal House author and substitute with Representative Roberts (Dustin) |
2020-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Osburn |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1931 (Carry Over) 2019-02-06 - Second Reading referred to Rules