OK HB1917 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Vetoed 05/31/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Vetoed 05/31/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public finance; federal funding; contingent budgets.
Title
Public finance; federal funding; contingent budgets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-24 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 47 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 67 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House: States' Rights Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 47 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 67 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House: States' Rights Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | House | Vetoed 05/31/2013 |
2013-05-24 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-05-24 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 |
2013-05-24 | Senate | CCR adopted, GCCA |
2013-05-24 | Senate | CCR read, GCCA |
2013-05-24 | House | To Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Ayes: 49 Nays: 21 |
2013-05-24 | House | Motion to reconsider tabled |
2013-05-24 | House | Ayes: 47 Nays: 21 |
2013-05-24 | House | Motion to reconsider tabled |
2013-05-22 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Jordan |
2013-05-22 | House | Emergency failed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 24 |
2013-05-22 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Reynolds |
2013-05-22 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 21 |
2013-05-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Walker, McCullough |
2013-05-22 | House | CCR adopted |
2013-05-21 | House | Title restored |
2013-05-21 | House | CCR submitted |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2013-05-06 | House | HC's named: Conference Committee on States Rights |
2013-05-02 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later |
2013-04-24 | House | SA's received |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-04-22 | Senate | coauthored by Treat |
2013-04-03 | Senate | coauthored by Brinkley |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2013-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-06 | House | Motion expired |
2013-03-04 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Jordan |
2013-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 26; Ayes: 68 Nays: 27 |
2013-03-04 | House | Amended |
2013-03-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lockhart, Kern, Newell |
2013-03-04 | House | General Order |
2013-02-21 | House | Authored by Senator Bingman (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Murphey, Moore |
2013-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute States' Rights Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to States' Rights |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Shannon |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |