OK HB1915 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1915
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; prohibiting certain funds in the Canceled Warrant Fund from being transferred into the General Revenue Fund; effective date.
Title
Public finance; prohibiting certain funds in the Canceled Warrant Fund from being transferred into the General Revenue Fund; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee: F DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Boles, McEntire |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1915 (Carry Over) 2019-02-11 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee