OK HB1912 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1912
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-15 - Remove Representative Schreiber as principal House author and substitute with Representative Fugate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-15 - Remove Representative Schreiber as principal House author and substitute with Representative Fugate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Air Force bases; creating the Tinker Air Force Base Support Act; effective date.
Title
Air Force bases; creating the Tinker Air Force Base Support Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Fugate [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | House | Remove Representative Schreiber as principal House author and substitute with Representative Fugate |
2023-02-08 | House | Remove Representative Fugate as principal House author and substitute with Representative Schreiber |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Fugate |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1912 (Carry Over) 2023-02-15 - Remove Representative Schreiber as principal House author and substitute with Representative Fugate
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1912&Session=2300 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/hB/HB1912%20INT.PDF |