OK HB1909 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Civil procedure; monies recovered on behalf of minors; authorizing deposit in college savings account; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil procedure; monies recovered on behalf of minors; authorizing deposit in college savings account; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16HouseApproved by Governor 04/16/2019
2019-04-10HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-10SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-04-10HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-04-09HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-04-09SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2019-04-09SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2019-04-09SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-03-26SenateReported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-03-06SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-06HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-05HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-05HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 100 Nays: 0
2019-03-05HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Caldwell (Chad)
2019-03-05HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-26HouseAuthored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
2019-02-26HouseCR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Boles, McEntire
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback