OK HB1907 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1907
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Higher education; priority enrollment for active members of the armed forces who are eligible for certain financial assistance; effective date.
Title
Higher education; priority enrollment for active members of the armed forces who are eligible for certain financial assistance; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2020-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Bice (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate |
2020-03-09 | House | General Order |
2020-02-19 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Conley |
2020-02-19 | House | Remove Representative Conley as principal House author and substitute with Representative Miller |
2020-02-19 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Higher Education and Career Tech Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Career Tech |
2020-02-11 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Conley |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1907 (Carry Over) 2019-02-06 - Second Reading referred to Rules