OK HB1896 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1896
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public health; Brain Death Standards Act; Board of Medical Licensure; rules; effective date.
Title
Public health; Brain Death Standards Act; Board of Medical Licensure; rules; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2021-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 16 |
2021-03-08 | House | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-08 | House | General Order |
2021-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Roberts (Sean) |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1896 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services