OK HB1890 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1890
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-01 - Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-01 - Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Oil and gas; well spacing and drilling units for common sources of supply; horizontal well units; effective date.
Title
Oil and gas; well spacing and drilling units for common sources of supply; horizontal well units; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | House | Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Ownbey |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1890 (Carry Over) 2017-03-01 - Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author)