OK HB1879 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal procedure; providing alternative method for inflicting punishment of death; effective date.
Title
Criminal procedure; providing alternative method for inflicting punishment of death; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony Sykes [R] | Rep. Mike Christian [R] | Sen. Ron Justice [R] | Sen. Don Barrington [R] |
Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Sen. Mike Schulz [R] | Sen. Brian Bingman [R] | Rep. Mike Brown [D] |
Sen. Jim Halligan [R] | Sen. Gary Stanislawski [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] | Sen. Mark Allen [R] |
Sen. Eddie Fields [R] | Sen. Frank Simpson [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] | Sen. Rick Brinkley [R] |
Sen. Ann Griffin [R] | Sen. Kyle Loveless [R] | Sen. Ron Sharp [R] | Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] |
Sen. Wayne Shaw [R] | Sen. Larry Boggs [R] | Sen. Corey Brooks [R] | Rep. Terry O'Donnell [R] |
Rep. John Jordan [R] | Sen. John Montgomery [R] | Sen. Stephanie Bice [R] | Sen. Jack Fry [R] |
Sen. Darcy Jech [R] | Sen. Marty Quinn [R] | Sen. Joseph Silk [R] | Sen. Jason Smalley [R] |
Sen. Roger Thompson [R] | Sen. Ervin Yen [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 11 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 11 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | House | Approved by Governor 04/17/2015 |
2015-04-13 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-13 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-09 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | coauthored by Griffin, David, Brooks, Shaw, Silk, Loveless, Yen, Simpson, Barrington, Stanislawski, Jech, Brown, Fry, Justice, Quinn, Bice, Allen, Boggs, Dahm, Thompson, Bingman, Halligan, Brinkley, Sharp, Schulz, Smalley, Fields, Jolley |
2015-04-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2015-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 10 |
2015-03-03 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2015-03-03 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Montgomery, Ritze |
2015-03-03 | House | General Order |
2015-02-11 | House | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Jordan, O'Donnell |
2015-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Civil Procedure |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Christian |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |