OK HB1853 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1853
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-26 - Reported Do Pass Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-26 - Reported Do Pass Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; fee allowances for licensed operators; retention of taxes and fees; tax for transfer of vehicle ownership; emergency.
Title
Motor vehicles; fee allowances for licensed operators; retention of taxes and fees; tax for transfer of vehicle ownership; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Dell Kerbs [R] | Sen. Chuck Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Aeronautics & Transportation: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation |
2024-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 1 |
2024-03-12 | House | General Order |
2024-02-29 | House | Emergency added |
2024-02-29 | House | Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-29 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-02-20 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-02-07 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Kerbs |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1853 (Carry Over) 2023-02-07 - Second Reading referred to Rules