OK HB1852 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1852
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; gross production tax; apportionments; effective date; emergency.
Title
Revenue and taxation; gross production tax; apportionments; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Approved by Governor 05/01/2019 |
2019-04-25 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-25 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-24 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services sub-committee |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 20; Ayes: 68 Nays: 26 |
2019-03-06 | House | General Order |
2019-02-28 | House | Authored by Senator Bice (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Fetgatter |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1852 (Carry Over) 2019-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2019