OK HB1849 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Elections; compensation of precinct officials; modifying compensation amounts; providing for mileage allowance; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections; compensation of precinct officials; modifying compensation amounts; providing for mileage allowance; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseTitle restored
2019-05-16HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-07SenateConference granted, GCCA
2019-05-01HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA
2019-04-24HouseSA's received
2019-04-24SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-23SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-23SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2019-04-23SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-04-10SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-04-03SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Rules Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-03-13SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-13HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-12HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-12HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 1
2019-03-12HouseAuthored by Senator Jech (principal Senate author)
2019-03-12HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-28HouseTitle stricken
2019-02-28HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
2019-02-12HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Lepak
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1849&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB1849%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB1849%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB1849%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB1849%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB1849%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1849%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCCS/HB1849%20CCS.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1849_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1849_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback