OK HB1825 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; relating to claims by certain governmental entities; modifying provisions related to claims for certain health care service costs; emergency.
Title
Revenue and taxation; relating to claims by certain governmental entities; modifying provisions related to claims for certain health care service costs; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 79 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | House | Approved by Governor 05/08/2015 |
2015-05-04 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-05-04 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-30 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-30 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 7; Ayes: 68 Nays: 16 |
2015-04-30 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2015-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 9 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Title restored |
2015-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | coauthored by David |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2015-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-25 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-02-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 21 |
2015-02-24 | House | General Order |
2015-02-12 | House | Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-12 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee sub-committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Martin |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |