OK HB1824 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public art; transferring the implementation and administration of the Oklahoma Art in Public Places Act from the Oklahoma Historical Society to the Oklahoma Arts Council; effective date.
Title
Public art; transferring the implementation and administration of the Oklahoma Art in Public Places Act from the Oklahoma Historical Society to the Oklahoma Arts Council; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Approved by Governor 04/28/2015 |
2015-04-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-21 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 14 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Title restored |
2015-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-04-20 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 9 |
2015-03-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer |
2015-03-09 | House | General Order |
2015-02-12 | House | Authored by Senator Holt (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-12 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2015-02-10 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee sub-committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Martin |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | 9030 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 9030 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 9030 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 9030 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 9030 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 9030 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 9030 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |