OK HB1820 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1820
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Failed in Committee - Veterans and Military Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Failed in Committee - Veterans and Military Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Militia; modifying various sections; effective date.
Title
Militia; modifying various sections; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Failed in Committee - Veterans and Military Affairs |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-14 | House | Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-14 | House | General Order |
2017-02-15 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Kannady |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1820 (Carry Over) 2017-04-06 - Failed in Committee - Veterans and Military Affairs