OK HB1814 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Roads, bridges and ferries; expanding special maintenance crew responsibility; effective date; emergency.
Title
Roads, bridges and ferries; expanding special maintenance crew responsibility; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Died in conference | |
2012-05-02 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2012-04-30 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on General Government and Transportation | |
2012-04-12 | SA's received | |
2012-04-12 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-11 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-11 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-11 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-04-11 | Title stricken | |
2011-04-11 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-30 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation sub-committee | |
2011-03-29 | Referred to Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation | |
2011-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2011-03-15 | First Reading | |
2011-03-15 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-14 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-14 | General Order | |
2011-03-02 | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-02 | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Shannon | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |