OK HB1810 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1810
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Definitions and general provisions; Open Meeting Act; authorizing audio or video records of proceedings in certain circumstances; prohibiting certain acts; effective date.
Title
Definitions and general provisions; Open Meeting Act; authorizing audio or video records of proceedings in certain circumstances; prohibiting certain acts; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Loring [D] | Sen. Marty Quinn [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2017-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 17 |
2017-03-20 | House | Amended |
2017-03-20 | House | House Rule suspended |
2017-03-20 | House | Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-20 | House | General Order |
2017-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Loring |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1810 (Carry Over) 2017-04-10 - Title stricken