OK HB1802 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; creating exemption for senior citizen centers. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Revenue and taxation; creating exemption for senior citizen centers. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Bailey [D] | Sen. Mary Easley [D] | Sen. John Ford [R] | Sen. Tom Ivester [D] |
Rep. Steve Martin [R] | Rep. Mike Reynolds [R] | Rep. Earl Sears [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] |
Sen. John Sparks [D] | Rep. Purcy Walker [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in conference | |
2010-02-23 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2010-02-16 | HC's named: Martin (Steve), Jones, Miller, Jackson | |
2010-02-03 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2009-05-13 | CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree | |
2009-05-11 | HC's named: Martin (Steve), Jones, Miller, Jackson | |
2009-05-07 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2009-04-29 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2009-04-14 | SA's received | |
2009-04-14 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-04-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-13 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2009-04-13 | coauthored by Easley | |
2009-04-13 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-04-02 | coauthored by Bailey | |
2009-04-02 | coauthored by Ivester, Sparks | |
2009-04-02 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2009-04-02 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2009-03-31 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; pending CR | |
2009-03-31 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Sparks, Ivester | |
2009-03-20 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Bailey | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2009-03-11 | First Reading | |
2009-03-11 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-10 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-10 | Authored by Senator Ford (principal Senate author) | |
2009-03-10 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sears, Walker | |
2009-03-10 | General Order | |
2009-02-26 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-26 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, Reynolds | |
2009-02-26 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Martin (Steve) | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |