OK HB1800 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1800
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Higher education; tuition status for spouse and dependent children of members of Armed Forces; effective date.
Title
Higher education; tuition status for spouse and dependent children of members of Armed Forces; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Roberts [R] | Sen. Frank Simpson [R] | Rep. Andy Fugate [D] | Rep. Robert Manger [R] |
Rep. Logan Phillips [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Veterans And Military Affairs: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Veterans And Military Affairs: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | House | Approved by Governor 05/05/2022 |
2022-05-04 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-05-04 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-05-03 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-05-03 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 |
2022-05-03 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2022-04-26 | House | SA's received |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Title restored |
2022-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 2 |
2022-03-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Phillips |
2022-03-08 | House | General Order |
2022-03-03 | House | Title stricken |
2022-03-03 | House | Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-03 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate, Manger |
2022-03-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Remove Representative Miller as principal House author and substitute with Representative Roberts (Eric) |
2021-02-08 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Miller |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1800 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee