OK HB1797 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-25 - Measure failed: Ayes: 2 Nays: 44
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-25 - Measure failed: Ayes: 2 Nays: 44
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; modifying application requirements for commercial driver licenses; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; modifying application requirements for commercial driver licenses; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Newberry [R] | Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 2 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-03-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-25 | Measure failed: Ayes: 2 Nays: 44 | |
2011-04-25 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-04-11 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2011-04-04 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2011-04-04 | Title stricken | |
2011-04-04 | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-23 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2011-03-21 | First Reading | |
2011-03-17 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-16 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-16 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 3 | |
2011-03-16 | Amended | |
2011-03-16 | General Order | |
2011-03-03 | Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-03 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Tibbs | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 11 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 11 | 901c | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 12 | 417 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 14 | 109 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 14 | 116 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 14 | 120 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 2 | 111 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 6 | 106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 6 | 117 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 6 | 205 | New Code | See Bill Text |