OK HB1796 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1796
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Vetoed 05/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Vetoed 05/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State government; State Employee Assistance Program; authorizing the Oklahoma Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services to enter into certain agreements; effective date.
Title
State government; State Employee Assistance Program; authorizing the Oklahoma Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services to enter into certain agreements; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate: General Government: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate: General Government: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Vetoed 05/01/2023 |
2023-04-25 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2023-04-25 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2023-04-24 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2023-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2023-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-07 | House | Authored by Senator Seifried (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron |
2023-03-07 | House | General Order |
2023-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Osburn |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1796 (Carry Over) 2023-05-01 - Vetoed 05/01/2023