OK HB1790 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1790
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; permitting school districts to offer certain remediation course; effective date.
Title
Schools; permitting school districts to offer certain remediation course; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | House | Approved by Governor 04/24/2017 |
2017-04-18 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-04-18 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-17 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 |
2017-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2017-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-08 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Condit, Hoskin |
2017-03-07 | House | General Order |
2017-02-21 | House | Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Cannaday |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1790 (Carry Over) 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017