OK HB1780 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Emergency clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Teacher compensation; modifying the Minimum Salary Schedule for certified personnel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teacher compensation; modifying the Minimum Salary Schedule for certified personnel.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10SenateEmergency clause stricken
2019-04-10SenateTitle stricken
2019-04-10SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading referred to Appropriations
2019-03-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Pemberton
2019-03-11SenateCoauthored by Representative Marti
2019-03-11SenateCoauthored by Representative Davis
2019-02-27SenateCoauthored by Representative Cornwell
2019-02-25SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-25HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-02-21HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-02-21HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
2019-02-21HouseAuthored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
2019-02-21HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean), Lawson, McBride
2019-02-21HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-14HouseEmergency added
2019-02-14HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Baker
2019-02-14HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget
2019-02-07HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative McCall
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback