OK HB1775 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Failed in Committee - General Government
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Failed in Committee - General Government
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Local government funding options; severance tax; counties; procedures; effective date.
Title
Local government funding options; severance tax; counties; procedures; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | Senate | Failed in Committee - General Government |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Finance Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 35 |
2015-03-03 | House | Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-03 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Dustin) |
2015-03-03 | House | General Order |
2015-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
68 | 1001 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 1001 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |