OK HB1774 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Roads and bridges; creating the Oklahoma Route 66 Centennial Commission Act; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Roads and bridges; creating the Oklahoma Route 66 Centennial Commission Act; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by Governor 04/30/2019
2019-04-25HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-25SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-04-25HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-04-24HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-04-24SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2019-04-24SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2
2019-04-24SenateAmendment restored bill to engrossed version
2019-04-24SenateTitle restored
2019-04-24SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-04-03SenateTitle stricken
2019-04-03SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-04-03SenateCoauthored by Senator Dossett
2019-03-28SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-03-28SenateReported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-03-14SenateCoauthored by Senator Bergstrom
2019-03-14SenateCoauthored by Representative West (Josh)
2019-03-14SenateCoauthored by Representative Wallace
2019-03-13SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-13HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-12HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-12HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
2019-03-12HouseAuthored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author)
2019-03-12HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Hilbert
2019-03-12HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-28HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative McCall
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback