OK HB1769 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-28 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]

Summary

Revenue and taxation; apportionment of gross production tax revenue; Energy Revenue Stabilization Fund; effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; apportionment of gross production tax revenue; Energy Revenue Stabilization Fund; effective dates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-28HouseTitle stricken
2013-02-28HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2013-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2013-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Russ
2013-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback