OK HB1768 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1768
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - Conference granted, GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - Conference granted, GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Game and fish; extending certain income tax checkoff.
Title
Game and fish; extending certain income tax checkoff.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2022-05-04 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA |
2022-05-02 | House | SA's received |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Remove as coauthor Senator Jett |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 4 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-04-28 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jett |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Jett; authored by Senator Stephens |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2021-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 6 |
2021-03-02 | House | General Order |
2021-02-22 | House | Authored by Senator Jett (principal Senate author) |
2021-02-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron |
2021-02-22 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Select Agencies Subcommittee Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Select Agencies Subcommittee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Roberts (Eric) |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1768 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed