OK HB1767 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1767
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Initiative and referendum; funding requirements; ballot titles; effective date.
Title
Initiative and referendum; funding requirements; ballot titles; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2021-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 18 |
2021-03-02 | House | Title stricken |
2021-03-02 | House | Amended |
2021-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Jett (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kendrix |
2021-03-02 | House | General Order |
2021-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Elections and Ethics Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Roberts (Eric) |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1767 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Rules