OK HB1760 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1760
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; programs of reading instruction; removing sunset on probationary promotion; effective date; emergency.
Title
Schools; programs of reading instruction; removing sunset on probationary promotion; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Henke [R] | Sen. Jason Smalley [R] | Rep. Jadine Nollan [R] | Rep. Tammy West [R] |
Sen. Gary Stanislawski [R] | Sen. Ron Sharp [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Approved by Governor 05/05/2017 |
2017-05-02 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-05-02 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-05-01 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-01 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2017-05-01 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2017-04-26 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Emergency added |
2017-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Sharp |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stanislawski |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-14 | House | Authored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-14 | House | General Order |
2017-02-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Nollan, West (Tammy) |
2017-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Henke |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1760 (Carry Over) 2017-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 1210 | 508C | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 508G | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |