OK HB1744 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; modifying the Lindsey Nicole Henry Scholarships for Student with Disabilities Program Act; effective date.
Title
Schools; modifying the Lindsey Nicole Henry Scholarships for Student with Disabilities Program Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Anderson [R] | Rep. David Dank [R] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] | Rep. Jason Nelson [R] |
Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: RECONSIDER (Y: 65 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: (Y: 76 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - House - House: Conference Committee on Education: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 60 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: RECONSIDER (Y: 65 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: (Y: 76 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - House - House: Conference Committee on Education: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 60 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Approved by Governor 05/26/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-19 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-19 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9 | |
2011-05-19 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-19 | CCR read | |
2011-05-18 | To Senate | |
2011-05-18 | Emergency failed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 25 | |
2011-05-18 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman | |
2011-05-18 | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 65 Nays: 23 | |
2011-05-18 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Nelson | |
2011-05-18 | Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 19; Ayes: 65 Nays: 27 | |
2011-05-18 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-17 | Emergency added | |
2011-05-17 | Enacting clause restored | |
2011-05-17 | Title restored | |
2011-05-17 | CCR submitted | |
2011-04-27 | Conference granted, SCs named Anderson, Ford, Jolley, Stanislawski, Garrison, Burrage | |
2011-04-25 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Education | |
2011-04-20 | SA's received | |
2011-04-20 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-19 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-19 | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 14 | |
2011-04-19 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-04-11 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-29 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2011-03-29 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2011-03-29 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-23 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2011-03-21 | First Reading | |
2011-03-17 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-16 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-16 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 24; Ayes: 60 Nays: 34 | |
2011-03-16 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-16 | Amended | |
2011-03-16 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dank | |
2011-03-16 | General Order | |
2011-03-02 | Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-02 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern | |
2011-03-02 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Nelson | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |