OK HB1743 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; Ad Valorem Tax Code; clarifying proper parties on appeal; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; Ad Valorem Tax Code; clarifying proper parties on appeal; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Brown [D] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Approved by Governor 04/28/2015 |
2015-04-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-21 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Title restored |
2015-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2015-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 1 |
2015-03-09 | House | General Order |
2015-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Brown (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Moore |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |