OK HB1742 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1742
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; Funeral Services Licensing Act; modifying and adding definitions; modifying fee; making certain information confidential; effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; Funeral Services Licensing Act; modifying and adding definitions; modifying fee; making certain information confidential; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Business and Commerce: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Business and Commerce: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | House | Approved by Governor 04/22/2021 |
2021-04-19 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-19 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-15 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2021-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 1 |
2021-03-10 | House | Authored by Senator Newhouse (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-10 | House | General Order |
2021-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Dills |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1742 (Carry Over) 2021-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2021