OK HB1738 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-26 - Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-26 - Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
State government; creating the Oklahoma Privacy Protection Act; emergency.
Title
State government; creating the Oklahoma Privacy Protection Act; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Lewis Moore [R] | Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - House - House: State and Federal Relations Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass State and Federal Relations Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to State and Federal Relations |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Moore |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |