OK HB1735 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Schools; creating the Educational Management Organizations Act of 2021; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; creating the Educational Management Organizations Act of 2021; effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-12HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
2021-02-09HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget
2021-02-09HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2021-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2021-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Dills
2021-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback