OK HB1735 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - coauthored by Brinkley
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - coauthored by Brinkley
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; enacting the Pension Systems Retirement Dividend Funding Act.
Title
Public finance; enacting the Pension Systems Retirement Dividend Funding Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-10 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 60 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | Senate | coauthored by Brinkley |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Pensions committee; CR filed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Pensions Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 30; Ayes: 60 Nays: 34 |
2015-03-10 | House | Authored by Senator Fields (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-10 | House | General Order |
2015-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws Committee |
2015-02-16 | House | Referred to Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws |
2015-02-16 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Roberts (Sean) |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 46 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 46 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |