OK HB1721 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1721

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Crimes and punishments; relating to the Bus Passenger Safety Act; modifying certain definitions; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes and punishments; relating to the Bus Passenger Safety Act; modifying certain definitions; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-27SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2017-03-21SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-21HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-03-20HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-03-20HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 8
2017-03-20HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Brecheen, Dahm
2017-03-20HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Faught, Coody, Bennett (John), Calvey, Gann, Roberts (Sean), Jordan, McDugle, Ritze
2017-03-20HouseGeneral Order
2017-02-16HouseAuthored by Senator Loveless (principal Senate author)
2017-02-16HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Moore
2017-02-16HouseRemove Representative Moore as principal House author and substitute with Representative Babinec
2017-02-16HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Public Safety
2017-02-08HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2017-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2017-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Moore
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB1721 (Carry Over) 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback