OK HB1714 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-19 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Boating under the influence of alcohol; providing for the revocation of driving privileges under certain circumstances; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Boating under the influence of alcohol; providing for the revocation of driving privileges under certain circumstances; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 21 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-19HouseTitle restored
2015-05-19HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Sharp
2015-05-19HouseCCR submitted
2015-05-07SenateConference granted, SCs named Shaw, Sykes, David, Crain, Sharp, Floyd, Sparks
2015-04-28HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety
2015-04-22HouseSA's received
2015-04-22SenateEngrossed to House
2015-04-21SenateReferred for engrossment
2015-04-21SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 5
2015-04-21SenateTitle stricken
2015-04-21SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2015-04-21SenateBacked up to General Order
2015-04-21SenateMotion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 37 Nays: 7
2015-04-15SenateNotice served to reconsider vote on measure Shaw
2015-04-15SenateMeasure failed: Ayes: 21 Nays: 26
2015-04-15SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2015-03-31SenateReported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2015-03-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2015-03-03SenateFirst Reading
2015-03-03HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2015-03-02HouseReferred for engrossment
2015-03-02HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
2015-03-02HouseGeneral Order
2015-02-23HouseAuthored by Senator Shaw (principal Senate author)
2015-02-23HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Cleveland, Johnson
2015-02-23HouseCR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
2015-02-03HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2015-02-02HouseAuthored by Representative Cox
2015-02-02HouseFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
476205New CodeSee Bill Text
6342108New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1714&Session=1500
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/hB/HB1714%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/HB1714%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/hB/HB1714%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/HB1714%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1714%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCCS/HB1714%20CCS.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB1714_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/HB1714_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback