OK HB1713 | 2024 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB1713

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Pharmacies; definitions; requirements; penalties; codification; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacies; definitions; requirements; penalties; codification; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-29HouseApproved by Governor 04/29/2024
2024-04-25HouseSent to Governor
2024-04-25SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2024-04-25HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2024-04-24HouseReferred for enrollment
2024-04-24SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2024-04-24SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3
2024-04-24SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2024-04-11SenateCoauthored by Senator Hicks
2024-04-11SenateReported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2023-03-30SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2023-03-22SenateFirst Reading
2023-03-22HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2023-03-21HouseReferred for engrossment
2023-03-21HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
2023-03-21HouseGeneral Order
2023-03-01HouseEmergency added
2023-03-01HouseAuthored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author)
2023-03-01HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
2023-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Insurance
2023-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Marti
2023-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB1713 (Carry Over) 2023-03-30 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1713&Session=2400
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/hB/HB1713%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB1713%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/HB1713%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/hB/HB1713%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/SFLR/HB1713%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENR/hB/HB1713%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB1713%20FA1%20MARTITJ-TJ(UNTIMELY%20FILED).PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB1713%20FULLPCS1%20TJ%20MARTI-TJ.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1713%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1713%20FULLPCS1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1713%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1713%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1713_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1713_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback