OK HB1712 | 2024 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB1712

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Health insurance; prohibiting refusal of coverage under certain circumstances; out-of-network provider; reimbursement; codification; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health insurance; prohibiting refusal of coverage under certain circumstances; out-of-network provider; reimbursement; codification; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate: VETO OVERRIDE WITH EMERGENCY (Y: 37 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - House - House: VETO OVERRIDE WITH EMER (Y: 82 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Retirement & Insurance: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-30HouseFiled with Secretary of State
2024-05-30SenateMeasure returned to House
2024-05-30SenateVeto overridden: Ayes: 37 Nays: 6
2024-05-29HouseTo Senate
2024-05-29HouseVeto overridden: Ayes: 82 Nays: 13
2024-04-29HouseVetoed 04/29/2024
2024-04-24HouseSent to Governor
2024-04-24SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2024-04-24HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2024-04-23HouseReferred for enrollment
2024-04-23HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
2024-04-23HouseSA's read, adopted
2024-03-25HouseSA's received
2024-03-25SenateEngrossed to House
2024-03-19SenateReferred for engrossment
2024-03-19SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3
2024-03-19SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2023-04-12SenatePlaced on General Order
2023-04-12SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations committee
2023-04-04SenateReferred to Appropriations
2023-04-04SenateReported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
2023-03-29SenateSecond Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2023-03-21SenateFirst Reading
2023-03-21HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2023-03-20HouseReferred for engrossment
2023-03-20HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
2023-03-20HouseAmended
2023-03-20HouseHouse Rule suspended
2023-03-20HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) McDugle
2023-03-20HouseGeneral Order
2023-03-02HouseAuthored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author)
2023-03-02HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
2023-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Health
2023-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Marti
2023-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB1712 (Carry Over) 2023-04-12 - Placed on General Order

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1712&Session=2400
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/hB/HB1712%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB1712%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/HB1712%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/SFLR/HB1712%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/hB/HB1712%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1712%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENR/hB/HB1712%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/HB1712%20(4-17-23)%20(GARVIN)%20FS%20FA1.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/HB1712%20(4-17-23)%20(GARVIN)%20FS%20WDFA1.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB1712%20FA1%20MARTITJ-TJ(UNTIMELY%20FILED).PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB1712%20FA2%20MARTITJ-TJ(UNTIMELY%20FILED).PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB1712%20FA3%20MARTITJ-TJ(UNTIMELY%20FILED).PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB1712%20FULLPCS1%20TJ%20MARTI-TJ.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/HB1712%20(2-21-24)%20(GARVIN)%20FS%20FA2.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1712%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1712%20FULLPCS1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1712%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1712%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1712%20FA2%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1712%20FA3%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/HB1712%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/Senate/HB1712%20ENGR%20FI.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/HB1712%20FA2%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1712%20SAHB%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1712_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1712_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback