OK HB1709 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB1709

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Children; Successful Adulthood Act; services; custody; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children; Successful Adulthood Act; services; custody; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-04 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10HouseApproved by Governor 05/10/2021
2021-05-05HouseSent to Governor
2021-05-05SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2021-05-05HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2021-05-04HouseReferred for enrollment
2021-05-04HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0
2021-05-04HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Provenzano
2021-05-04HouseSA's read, adopted
2021-04-14HouseSA's received
2021-04-14SenateEngrossed to House
2021-04-13SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-04-13SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
2021-04-13SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2021-03-29SenateEmergency added
2021-03-29SenateReported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2021-03-15SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2021-03-02SenateFirst Reading
2021-03-02HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2021-03-01HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-03-01HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
2021-03-01HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Munson, Fugate, Dills
2021-03-01HouseGeneral Order
2021-02-16HouseAuthored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author)
2021-02-16HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Lawson, Randleman
2021-02-16HouseCR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
2021-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services
2021-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Hill
2021-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB1709 (Carry Over) 2021-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2021

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1709&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/hB/HB1709%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/HB1709%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/hB/HB1709%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/HB1709%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1709%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENR/hB/HB1709%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/HB1709%20CA1.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1709%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/HB1709%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/Senate/HB1709%20ENGR%20FI.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1709%20SAHB%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1709_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1709_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback