OK HB1708 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1708
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Board of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services; modifying Board membership; effective date.
Title
Board of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services; modifying Board membership; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | House | Approved by Governor 05/16/2017 |
2017-05-10 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-05-10 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-09 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2017-05-09 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2017-04-26 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2017-03-07 | Senate | coauthored by Brumbaugh |
2017-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 1 |
2017-03-06 | House | General Order |
2017-02-14 | House | Authored by Senator Yen (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Ritze |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1708 (Carry Over) 2017-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2017