OK HB1707 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1707
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Measure failed: Ayes: 15 Nays: 26
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Measure failed: Ayes: 15 Nays: 26
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Property subject to forced sale; modifying appraisal, bidding and sale procedures; effective date.
Title
Property subject to forced sale; modifying appraisal, bidding and sale procedures; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 15 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services & Pensions Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services & Pensions Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 15 Nays: 26 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2017-05-23 | Senate | CCR read |
2017-05-23 | House | To Senate |
2017-05-23 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 22 |
2017-05-23 | House | CCR adopted |
2017-05-20 | House | Title restored |
2017-05-20 | House | CCR submitted |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Stanislawski, Sykes, Daniels, Standridge, Smalley, Sparks, Floyd |
2017-05-02 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Banking, Financial Services and Pensions |
2017-04-20 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-19 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Judiciary committee |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2017-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-21 | House | Motion expired |
2017-03-14 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative McEachin |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 18 |
2017-03-14 | House | Amended |
2017-03-14 | House | General Order |
2017-02-14 | House | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative McDaniel |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1707 (Carry Over) 2017-05-24 - Measure failed: Ayes: 15 Nays: 26