OK HB1705 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1705
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Environment and natural resources; modifying duties and power of the Department; modifying certain fee ranges; effective date; emergency.
Title
Environment and natural resources; modifying duties and power of the Department; modifying certain fee ranges; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | House | Approved by Governor 04/19/2021 |
2021-04-13 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-13 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-12 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-02 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-01 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 1 |
2021-03-01 | House | General Order |
2021-02-18 | House | Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author) |
2021-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2021-02-10 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Newton |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1705 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2021