OK HB1704 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; relating to the creation and duties of the State and Education Employees Group Insurance Board; require contract with vendor that offers a web-based, doctor-patient mutual accountability incentive program. Effective date.
Title
State government; relating to the creation and duties of the State and Education Employees Group Insurance Board; require contract with vendor that offers a web-based, doctor-patient mutual accountability incentive program. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Benge [R] | Sen. Glenn Coffee [R] | Rep. David Derby [R] | Rep. Mark McCullough [R] |
Rep. Jason Murphey [R] | Rep. Jason Nelson [R] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-20 - House - House: (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-03-11 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 50 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2009-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2009-03-11 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 50 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2009-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in conference | |
2010-05-19 | Further conference granted, same conferees | |
2010-05-17 | 2 CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees | |
2010-05-13 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Derby | |
2010-05-13 | Remove Representative Derby as principal House author and substitute with Representative Benge | |
2010-05-13 | 2 CCR submitted | |
2010-05-11 | HC's added: Ortega | |
2010-05-05 | Further conference granted, HCs named: Benge, Murphey, Jackson, Moore, Miller, Derby, Scott, Pittman, Nations | |
2010-05-04 | SCs named Coffee, Aldridge, Brown, Lamb | |
2010-05-04 | Withdrawn from GCCA - referred to conference | |
2010-05-04 | CCR rejected, further conference requested, GCCA | |
2009-05-20 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2009-05-20 | To Senate | |
2009-05-20 | Measure passed: Ayes: 56 Nays: 42 | |
2009-05-20 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Tibbs, McCullough | |
2009-05-20 | CCR adopted | |
2009-05-20 | Enacting clause restored | |
2009-05-20 | Title restored | |
2009-05-20 | CCR submitted | |
2009-05-05 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2009-05-05 | HC's named: Derby, Murphey, Pittman, Nelson, Scott, Schwartz, Shannon, Nations | |
2009-04-27 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2009-04-15 | SA's received | |
2009-04-15 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-04-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-14 | Measure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 21 | |
2009-04-14 | General Order, Amended | |
2009-04-02 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2009-04-02 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2009-04-02 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-12 | First Reading | |
2009-03-12 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-11 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-11 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 55 Nays: 41; Ayes: 50 Nays: 39 | |
2009-03-11 | Title stricken | |
2009-03-11 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2009-03-11 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman, Nelson | |
2009-03-11 | General Order | |
2009-02-24 | Authored by Senator Coffee (principal Senate author) | |
2009-02-24 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Murphey | |
2009-02-24 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Derby | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 139 | 109 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 41 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 41 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 41 | 51 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 41 | 5a | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 41 | 5e | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 41 | 5f | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 41 | 5g | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 41 | 5h | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 41 | 5i | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 41 | 5j | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 41 | 5l | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 41 | 5m | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 41 | 5p | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 41 | 5q | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 41 | 5r | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 41 | 5s | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 41 | 5t | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 41 | 5u | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 41 | 5v | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 41 | 5x | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 10 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1304 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 50 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 50 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 85 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |