OK HB1697 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mental health; permitting court to order assisted outpatient treatment; effective date.
Title
Mental health; permitting court to order assisted outpatient treatment; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Denney [R] | Sen. Ann Griffin [R] | Rep. Jeannie McDaniel [D] | Rep. Mike Shelton [D] |
Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] | Rep. Brian Renegar [D] | Sen. Kim David [R] |
Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Public Health Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Public Health Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 04/26/2016 |
2016-04-21 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-04-21 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-20 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-20 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 0 |
2016-04-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Renegar |
2016-04-20 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2016-03-16 | House | SA's received |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Title restored |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2016-03-15 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2016-03-10 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2016-02-23 | Senate | coauthored by David |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2015-03-23 | Senate | coauthored by McDaniel (Jeannie) |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2015-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 3 |
2015-03-11 | House | Title stricken |
2015-03-11 | House | Amended |
2015-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Shelton, Sherrer, Hoskin |
2015-03-11 | House | General Order |
2015-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2015-02-04 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Denney |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43A | 1 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43A | 1 | 106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43A | 1 | 107 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43A | 1 | 108 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43A | 3 | 325 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43A | 5 | 410 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43A | 5 | 416 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43A | 5 | 417 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43A | 5 | 419 | New Code | See Bill Text |