OK HB1693 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Schools; requiring school grade to be based on multimeasures approach based upon certain indicators; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; requiring school grade to be based on multimeasures approach based upon certain indicators; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 31 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Table (Y: 26 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 69 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 22 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2017-02-27 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01HouseApproved by Governor 04/28/2017
2017-04-24HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-24SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2017-04-24HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2017-04-20HouseReferred for enrollment
2017-04-20SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2017-04-20SenateEmergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 12
2017-04-20SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 13
2017-04-20SenateAmendment restored bill to engrossed version
2017-04-20SenateEmergency clause restored
2017-04-20SenateTitle restored
2017-04-20SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2017-04-12SenateEmergency clause stricken
2017-04-12SenateTitle stricken
2017-04-12SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2017-04-10SenateReferred to Appropriations
2017-04-10SenateReported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
2017-03-27SenateSecond Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2017-03-13SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-13HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-03-09HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-03-09HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 20; Ayes: 69 Nays: 17
2017-03-09HouseMotion to suspend rule failed
2017-03-09HouseAmended
2017-03-09HouseAuthored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author)
2017-03-09HouseGeneral Order
2017-02-28HouseEmergency added
2017-02-28HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
2017-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2017-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Martin
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
701210541New CodeSee Bill Text
701210545New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback